WILLIAM ADLINGTON CADBURY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 213629
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ADRIAN DAVID MILLS THOMAS Trustee 29 November 1994 None on record
SOPHY JULIET BLANDY Chair 16 December 2002 None on record
KATHERINE MARY VAN HAGEN CADBURY Trustee 09 December 1986 None on record
JANINE EMMA COBAIN Trustee 19 March 2007 None on record
VICTORIA EMMELINE MOHAN Trustee 29 November 2012 None on record
SARAH STAFFORD Trustee 08 November 1972 None on record
MARGARET SALMON Trustee 15 November 1988
MOUNT PLEASANT SCHOOL FARM On time
THE WORGAN TRUST On time
RUPERT ADLINGTON CADBURY Trustee 31 December 1979
TANSOR VILLAGE HALL On time
THE OAKDALE TRUST On time
JOHN CORNELIUS PENNY Trustee 29 November 1994 None on record