THE CENTRAL ENGLAND AREA QUAKER MEETING CHARITIES

Charity number: 224571
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Robert Jago Pegler Trustee 01 January 2014
CHARITIES OF SUSANNA COLE AND OTHERS Charity reporting is up to date
Gillian Margaret Smith Trustee 01 December 2018 None on record
ROBERT FRANK MORRIS Trustee 01 January 2016
SOUTH BIRMINGHAM FRIENDS INSTITUTE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
THE FRIENDS HALL, GOOCH STREET, RECREATION GROUND TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
SUE THOMPSON Trustee 21 June 2013
TALKING FRIENDS Charity reporting is up to date
CHARITIES OF SUSANNA COLE AND OTHERS Charity reporting is up to date
PATRICIA MARY BRADBURY Trustee 01 January 2015
WARWICKSHIRE AND WEST MERCIA PROBATION CARE TRUST LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
Christine Edith Bagnall Trustee 12 September 2020 None on record
Jill Margaret Stow Trustee 07 March 2015 None on record
Fiona Joy Waterhouse Trustee 12 September 2020 None on record
James Edward Green Trustee 01 July 2019
WALSALL BEREAVEMENT SUPPORT SERVICE Charity reporting is up to date
JOHN HENRY KIMBERLEY Trustee 12 May 2015
CHARITIES OF SUSANNA COLE AND OTHERS Charity reporting is up to date
ANNE AUSTIN Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
JUDITH ALICE JENNER Chair 01 January 2017 None on record
Peter John Ullathorne Trustee 20 October 2018 None on record