CHURCH OF ENGLAND SOLDIERS', SAILORS' & AIRMEN'S CLUBS

Charity number: 226684
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amanda Cecelia Rodgers BSc FCA Trustee 28 April 2016 None on record
ANDREW JOSEPH COBB Trustee 25 January 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TADLEY On time
David John Foster FCA Trustee 20 November 2019 None on record
Commander Simon John Snowball Royal Navy Trustee 30 April 2019 None on record
COMMANDER TONY MIZEN ROYAL NAVY Trustee 18 March 2013 None on record
Rear Admiral Al Rymer Chair 12 February 2014 None on record
Charles Edward Haviland Ackroyd Trustee 25 January 2016 None on record
Ian Hamilton Currie FCA Trustee 11 April 2019 None on record
Commander Jeremy Francis John Simpson Royal Navy Trustee 30 April 2019 None on record