GINGERBREAD, THE CHARITY FOR SINGLE PARENT FAMILIES

Charity number: 230750
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
George Andrew Coleman Trustee 10 January 2018 None on record
ALISON TAYLOR Trustee 16 February 2016 None on record
Diane Gault Trustee 29 April 2020 None on record
Joyce Materego Trustee 10 January 2018 None on record
Evangelos Raptis Trustee 05 February 2020 None on record
Charlotte Thorne Trustee 25 November 2014 None on record
Tina Hamilton Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record
Sir Martin Eugene Donnelly KCB CMG Trustee 07 March 2018
THE ROYAL ANNIVERSARY TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF DRAMATIC ART Charity reporting is up to date
Jasmin Choudhury Trustee 10 June 2019 None on record
FRANCES PARRY Trustee 13 June 2016 None on record