ST. BARNABAS HOSPICES (SUSSEX) LTD

Charity number: 256789
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RUTH TAYLOR Trustee 28 February 2017
CARE FOR VETERANS Charity reporting is up to date
Anthony Clark Trustee 30 November 2016
LEO HOUSE CHILDREN'S HOSPICE Charity reporting is up to date
Patricia Woolgar Chair 08 December 2014 None on record
Patrick Neil Gatley Trustee 23 January 2018 None on record
MAUREEN CHOWEN Trustee 21 June 2012 None on record
David Brian Pegler Trustee 24 November 2015 None on record
Neil Blanchard Trustee 27 March 2018 None on record
Nicola Torricelli Trustee 22 October 2019 None on record
JILL CARNIE Trustee 24 August 2018
SPRINGBOARD PROJECT Charity reporting is up to date
Tony Moss Trustee 23 January 2018 None on record
MARTIN GODSMARK Trustee 23 January 2018
CARPENTER BOX CHARITABLE FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
Lisa Kenna Trustee 22 October 2019 None on record
Stuart Palma Trustee 02 January 2019 None on record