SURVIVAL INTERNATIONAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 267444
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TOM YEBA HUGH-JONES Trustee 08 May 2012 None on record
CLARE CATHERINE DIXON OBE Trustee 24 January 2012
LATIN AMERICAN CHILDREN'S TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
ARCHBISHOP ROMERO TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
SUE EDITH BRANFORD Trustee 21 January 2003 None on record
CAROLINE PEARCE Trustee 23 January 2007 None on record
Thomas Joseph Fraine Trustee 01 March 2016 None on record
JAMES CAMERON WILSON Trustee 02 May 1996 None on record
Herve Chandes Trustee 24 January 2017 None on record
JULIET CECILIA WALKER BSC Trustee 09 May 1997
THE ALLEN LANE FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
MICHAEL JOHN DAVIS Trustee 23 January 2002 None on record
JESSICA MARY SAINSBURY Trustee 27 April 2005
THE ALAN AND BABETTE SAINSBURY CHARITABLE FUND Charity reporting is up to date
THE TEDWORTH CHARITABLE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
STAPLES TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
Ghislaine de Give Trustee 24 January 2017 None on record
JAMES LIONEL NORMAN WOOD DR Chair 02 May 1996 None on record
CLARA BRAGGIO Trustee 23 January 2018 None on record
Mr Robin-Hanbury Tenison Trustee 13 June 1991 None on record
Diana de Horna Cicka Trustee 16 April 2018 None on record