THE A1 STEAM LOCOMOTIVE TRUST

Charity number: 1022834
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Bruce Trustee 11 December 2017 None on record
Huw Jonathan Parker Trustee 16 November 2018 None on record
Richard John Courteney-Harris MBE Trustee 20 October 2020 None on record
James Christopher Walker Trustee 04 April 2014 None on record
MARK COLIN ALLATT Trustee None on record
Graeme E Bunker-James Trustee
THE GRESLEY SOCIETY TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
COLONEL STEPHEN DAVIES MBE Chair 07 October 2019
THE FRIENDS OF THE SIERRA LEONE NATIONAL RAILWAY MUSEUM Charity reporting is up to date
THE DUKE OF LANCASTER'S REGIMENT LANCASHIRE INFANTRY MUSEUM Charity reporting is 27 days late
BALA LAKE RAILWAY TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
Graham Langer Trustee 21 January 2017 None on record