THE FRIENDS OF THE SIERRA LEONE NATIONAL RAILWAY MUSEUM

Charity number: 1179579
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEVE DAVIES Trustee 24 May 2014
THE DUKE OF LANCASTER'S REGIMENT LANCASHIRE INFANTRY MUSEUM Charity reporting is 24 days late
BALA LAKE RAILWAY TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
THE A1 STEAM LOCOMOTIVE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
Christopher McKenna Trustee 05 October 2019 None on record
Sir Philip Williams Bart Trustee 19 May 2018 None on record
FRANCIS PATERSON MBE Trustee 24 May 2018 None on record
HELEN MARGARET ASHBY OBE BA FMA Chair 24 May 2014
WELSHPOOL AND LLANFAIR LIGHT RAILWAY PRESERVATION CO. LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
1ST ACOMB (YORK) BOYS' BRIGADE Charity reporting is up to date
ANTHONY JOHN COULLS Trustee 24 May 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BISHOP AUCKLAND Charity reporting is up to date
WILLIAM DAVID BICKERS-JONES Trustee 03 June 2017
WELSHPOOL AND LLANFAIR LIGHT RAILWAY PRESERVATION CO. LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date