THE BEDE GRIFFITHS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1106071
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lucie-Jane Lewis MBE Trustee 27 April 2019
LYMINGTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION On time
PIPPA MISTRY-NORMAN Trustee 27 July 2014 None on record
RICHARD VAN MAANEN Trustee 21 August 2016
BANCROFT'S SCHOOL
HITEN ANAND Trustee 01 December 2017 None on record
MRS MARY PRUSS Trustee None on record
MARK LYNDON BRADBERRY Chair None on record
CAROLYN ANN CARTER Trustee 21 August 2016
EVES CORNER WOMEN'S INSTITUTE On time
DANBURY VILLAGE HALL On time
GREVILLE JOHN NORMAN CPFA, AGP Trustee None on record
MICHAEL PRUSS Trustee 05 April 2020 None on record