Trustees LYMINGTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1188765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alastair Jeremy Caldwell | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Frances Turner | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Allen | Trustee | 18 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Norman Browne | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Dawson | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lucie-Jane Lewis MBE | Trustee | 25 March 2020 |
|
|||||
JUDY RUFFELL | Trustee | 25 March 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.