FRIENDS OF TEWKESBURY ABBEY

Charity number: 211236
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MAJ GEN ALAN HAWLEY CBE QHP Trustee 05 July 2015
THE RAMC CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
Katherine Anne Watson Trustee 07 July 2019
TEWKESBURY HISTORICAL SOCIETY Charity reporting is up to date
Dr Ivor David Parsons BSc, PhD Trustee 05 July 2015
THE TEWKESBURY ABBEY SCHOLA CANTORUM CHORAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND Charity reporting is up to date
THE TEWKESBURY ABBEY FOUNDATION Recently registered
Dr Peter Smail Trustee 02 July 2017
REVEREND C W GROVES ALMSHOUSES Charity reporting is up to date
Dr Ian John White Trustee 07 July 2019 None on record
PATRICIA PURKISS Trustee 03 July 2011 None on record
NEIL HEMINGWAY BIRDSALL Trustee None on record
GRAHAM LESLIE FINCH Chair 06 July 2014 None on record
DR ANDREW NICHOLAS CROWTHER Trustee
GLOUCESTERSHIRE EYE THERAPY TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
THE FRIENDS OF DEERHURST CHURCH Charity reporting is up to date
Nicola Hawley Trustee 02 July 2017
REVEREND C W GROVES ALMSHOUSES Charity reporting is up to date
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TEWKESBURY ABBEY WITH WALTON CARDIFF Charity reporting is up to date
John Frederick Innes Comins Trustee 02 July 2017 None on record
Rev Charles Whitney Trustee 02 July 2017 None on record
Sylvia Lancelot Trustee 07 July 2019 None on record
John Parkes Trustee 07 July 2019 None on record
Janice Smail Trustee 05 July 2015 None on record
STEPHEN CHRISTOPHER EVANS Trustee 06 July 2014 None on record
Joanne Elizabeth Raywood Trustee 02 July 2017
TEWKESBURY MUSEUM Recently registered
REV CANON PAUL RHYS WILLIAMS Trustee 06 July 2014
TWYNING CHARITY FOR THE VICAR Charity reporting is up to date
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TEWKESBURY ABBEY WITH WALTON CARDIFF Charity reporting is up to date
TWYNING RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
TEWKESBURY PARISH TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
THE CENTRE FOR MARIAN STUDIES Recently registered
Ian James Bloom Trustee 07 July 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TEWKESBURY ABBEY WITH WALTON CARDIFF Charity reporting is up to date
THE TEWKESBURY ABBEY FOUNDATION Recently registered