INTERNATIONAL SEAFARERS' WELFARE AND ASSISTANCE NETWORK

Charity number: 1102946
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Winbow Trustee 28 July 2015 None on record
John Canias Trustee 09 July 2015 None on record
Karin Orsel Trustee 07 December 2015 None on record
Karen Waltham Trustee 22 April 2020 None on record
Michael Philip Pinto Trustee 27 June 2017 None on record
Dr Suresh Idnani Trustee 22 January 2019 None on record
Deepak Shetty Trustee 01 December 2017 None on record
RENE ANDERSEN Trustee 22 April 2020 None on record
SUE Henney Trustee 22 April 2020 None on record