NEW ISRAEL FUND

Charity number: 1060081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin Paisner Trustee 07 September 2016
THE LILY AND MARCUS SIEFF CHARITABLE TRUST Received: 1 day late
BEN GURION UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE STUART YOUNG FOUNDATION Received: On time
FRIENDS OF THE ISRAEL CANCER ASSOCIATION Overdue by 132 days
HOLOCAUST EDUCATIONAL TRUST Received: On time
THE MAURICE AND VIVIENNE WOHL PHILANTHROPIC FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE RAYMAN HANBURY CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
OHEL SARAH UK Received: On time
THE MAURICE WOHL CHARITABLE FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE SIERATZKI CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
BRITISH FRIENDS OF EDITH WOLFSON HOSPITAL Overdue by 498 days
SHAARE ZEDEK UK Received: On time
THE PHILLIPS FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
TEALE CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Jane Grabiner Trustee 10 September 2015 None on record
PAUL BURGER Trustee 10 September 2015
BELSIZE SQUARE SYNAGOGUE Received: On time
Noeleen Cohen Chair 30 April 2021
CITIZENS UK CHARITY Received: On time
IKAMVA LABANTU
NORTH WESTERN REFORM SYNAGOGUE Received: 12 days late
NORTH WESTERN REFORM SYNAGOGUE Recently registered
LONDON JEWISH FORUM Received: On time
Dana Kohava Segal Trustee 02 February 2021 None on record
Hannah Miriam Brady Trustee 02 February 2021 None on record
NOAM TAMIR Trustee 17 July 2012
THE SIR SIGMUND STERNBERG CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
THE TAMIR-STERNBERG FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE FAITH & BELIEF FORUM Received: On time
Suzanne Caroline Jacobs Trustee 25 November 2019 None on record
JOHN COHEN Trustee 17 July 2012
EUROPEAN UNION FOR PROGRESSIVE JUDAISM Received: On time
Paul Amit Trustee 25 November 2019 None on record
LANCE BLACKSTONE Trustee None on record
JULIE BLANE Trustee 17 July 2012 None on record
Dr Juliet Stevens Trustee 20 October 2015 None on record
SARAH PETERS Trustee 10 September 2015 None on record