GOVERNORS OF THE CHARITY FOR RELIEF OF THE POOR WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OF CLERGYMEN (COMMONLY CALLED CLERGY SUPPORT TRUST)

Charity number: 207736
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE RT REVD TIM THORNTON Trustee 09 November 2017
VOLUNTEER CORNWALL On time
THE LAMBETH CONFERENCE On time
RICHARD DAVID FARMBROUGH Trustee 08 November 2018 None on record
JEREMY ARTHUR HARGREAVES Trustee 08 November 2018 None on record
JONATHAN MARTIN ROBIN PRICHARD MA MBA Trustee 10 June 2014
CHICHESTER THEOLOGICAL TRUST On time
FORWARD IN FAITH On time
THE SUSSEX HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST On time
CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY CENTRE (HOVE)
HYDE CHARITABLE TRUST On time
THE COMMUNITY TRUST OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY On time
MARTIN LUKE COOPER Trustee 14 November 2019
RIVERSIDE CHURCH (SOUTHWELL) On time
SOUTHWELL AND NOTTINGHAM DIOCESAN GUILD OF CHURCH BELL RINGERS BELL FUND On time
THE REVD WENDY PATRICIA KENNEDY Trustee 13 December 2012 None on record
STEPHEN WILLIAM HOGG Trustee 14 November 2019
SOCIETY OF THE SACRED MISSION EUROPE On time
THE REVD CANON SIMON BUTLER Chair 08 November 2018
BATTERSEA UNITED CHARITIES On time
THE FRIENDS OF BATTERSEA PARISH CHURCH On time
SIR WALTER ST.JOHN'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY On time
THE ARCHBISHOPS' COUNCIL On time
THE KATHERINE LOW SETTLEMENT LIMITED On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S BATTERSEA On time
THE REVD CANON ROXANNE FAY HUNTE Trustee 26 October 2012
GUYANA DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION On time
JACQUELINE EMILY JORDAN Trustee 08 November 2018 None on record
THE VEN DAVID WALTER LOWMAN Trustee 26 October 2012
SIR ANTONY BROWNE'S SCHOOL TRUST, BRENTWOOD On time
ADAM CHAMBERLAIN Trustee 14 November 2019 None on record
THE REVD DR JACK DUNN Trustee 09 September 2014 None on record
THE REVD NANCY ELISABETH GOODRICH Trustee 14 November 2019
BOLTON LE SANDS FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL On time
PATRICK NICHOLAS CHARLES WALKER Trustee 26 October 2012
RIPON COLLEGE CUDDESDON On time