COMPASSION UK CHRISTIAN CHILD DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1077216
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BERTRAM SINNIAH Trustee 14 June 2019 None on record
JONATHAN TOOHEY Chair 27 September 2014 None on record
Dr Richmond Wandera Trustee 18 October 2019 None on record
GRAHAM WILLIAMS Trustee None on record
DELFIN POSADA Trustee 12 March 2018 None on record
Dr Anna Maslin Trustee 06 March 2020 None on record
CATHRYN CLARKE Trustee 15 February 2012
BORN TO BE BEAUTIFUL On time
KENNETH MORGAN Trustee
VIRGINIA WATER CORONATION PLAYING FIELD On time
THE DAVID CHILCOTT MEMORIAL FUND On time