DONATE4REFUGEES

Charity number: 1168435
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Karen Canty Trustee 11 May 2017 None on record
BETH MEAD SQUIRES Trustee 30 June 2016 None on record
Santanu Mahanta Trustee 10 January 2018 None on record
Tina Mwazange Trustee 21 August 2020 None on record
AMBER BAUER Chair 26 July 2016 None on record