THE ENVIRONMENT CENTRE (TEC)

Charity number: 1031482
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR ALAN WHITEHEAD MP Trustee 19 April 2004
THE MILLENNIUM THIRD AGE CENTRE On time
Patrick James Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
COLIN RAE ROWLAND Chair 22 October 2007 None on record
IAN NELSON Trustee 20 January 2009 None on record
Alexander Howison Trustee 11 May 2017 None on record
Alexia Sara Drakakis Trustee 30 October 2014 None on record