MAGIC ME

Charity number: 328331
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Afsana Begum Trustee 13 February 2020 None on record
Alison Margaret Harvie Chair 26 November 2014 None on record
Denise Carole Leander Trustee 19 October 2015 None on record
Damian Peter Hebron Trustee 13 February 2019 None on record
Hazel Maud Gould Trustee 13 February 2019 None on record
Caroline Louise Gellatly Trustee 13 February 2020 None on record
Aimee Coleen O'Malley Trustee 19 October 2015 None on record
David Russell Trustee 23 January 2019 None on record
Max Glazer-Munck Trustee 13 February 2020 None on record
Philip John Cave Trustee 13 February 2019 None on record