MIDLANDS AIR AMBULANCE CHARITY

Charity number: 1143118
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MOHAMMED WAHEED SALEEM Trustee 05 October 2018 None on record
NICHOLAS ANDREW WHALE Trustee 18 September 2013 None on record
ROBERT FULTON Trustee 18 September 2013 None on record
Gareth Dellenty Trustee 30 January 2020 None on record
Andrew Gordon Lennox Trustee 01 April 2017 None on record
Edwin Marriott Trustee 30 January 2020 None on record
Kate-Emma Bailey Trustee 08 July 2019 None on record
Robert Granville Douglas Trustee 12 November 2019 None on record
ROGER Brentnall PEMBERTON Chair 18 September 2013
SHROPSHIRE MASONIC CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION Charity reporting is up to date