Trustees THE NORTHREPPS BELL MAINTENANCE FUND

Charity number: 296256
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev PAUL CUBITT Chair 07 May 2016
CHARITY OF THOMAS BULLOCK
Overdue by 117 days
THE NORWICH DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION OF RINGERS BELL RESTORATION FUND
Received: On time
NORWICH DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION OF RINGERS
Received: On time
Thomas Peter John Davis Trustee 07 May 2022
FUEL ALLOTMENT
Received: On time
THE NORWICH DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION OF RINGERS BELL RESTORATION FUND
Received: On time
NORWICH DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION OF RINGERS
Received: On time
Neil Thomas Trustee 31 August 2021
None on record
Rev Richard Aubrey Turk Trustee 04 May 2019
NORWICH DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION OF RINGERS
Received: On time
Nicola Rose Thomas Trustee 05 May 2018
THE NORWICH DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION OF RINGERS BELL RESTORATION FUND
Received: On time
NORWICH DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION OF RINGERS
Received: On time
Margaret Gillian Breeze Trustee 05 May 2018
None on record