THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, RIVERHEAD WITH DUNTON GREEN

Charity number: 1128522
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charlotte Rakhit Trustee 17 April 2018 None on record
BENNET ROLAND SMITH Trustee 07 June 2013 None on record
VERONICA ANN TODD Trustee 21 October 2011 None on record
Sarah Stott Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
Daphne Dorothy Harrison Trustee 19 April 2015 None on record
Sarah Way Trustee 17 April 2018 None on record
Alison Bull Chair 17 April 2018 None on record
Simon Bull Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
Rachel Wigley Trustee 17 April 2018 None on record
ANNE ELIZABETH Blakeley BSC MIEE Trustee None on record
MARGARET NICHOLAS Trustee 21 October 2011
CHIPSTEAD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE On time
Alison Wakefield Trustee 17 April 2018 None on record
STUART WIGLEY Trustee 18 September 2012 None on record
Diane Williams Trustee 27 April 2014 None on record
Barry Sharp Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
Andrew Swidzinski Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
Susan Allender Trustee 17 April 2018 None on record