TOTNES MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 296684
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter David Bethel Trustee 06 June 2014
TOTNES MUSEUM TRUST Recently registered
Valerie Anne Austin Trustee 01 March 2019
TOTNES MUSEUM TRUST Recently registered
TONY WHITTY Chair None on record
Alan Paul Roffey Trustee 13 March 2017 None on record
Thomas Coia Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
JUDY WESTACOTT Trustee
THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE TOTNES AND DISTRICT HOSPITALS Charity reporting is up to date
THE WAKEFIELD ALMSHOUSES CHARITABLE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
TOTNES MUSEUM TRUST Recently registered
DEVON PLAY ASSOCIATION Charity reporting is up to date
DAISY AND RAINBOW CHILDCARE (TOTNES) Charity reporting is up to date
THE WAKEFIELD ALMSHOUSES CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
Trevor Alan Wills Trustee 05 October 2020 None on record