KENT, SURREY & SUSSEX AIR AMBULANCE TRUST

Charity number: 1021367
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR HELEN BOWCOCK OBE DL Chair 21 May 2014 None on record
PATRICK DAVID STEWART Trustee 30 August 2016 None on record
Michael Docherty Trustee 01 August 2019 None on record
Dr Andrew Rhodes Trustee 14 March 2019 None on record
Tim Oakes Trustee 30 August 2016 None on record
Barney Burgess Trustee 30 November 2017 None on record
Andrew Martyn Farrant Trustee 10 March 2016 None on record
Paul Jonathan Barrett Trustee 15 January 2014 None on record