ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PROTECTION OF BIRDS

Charity number: 207076
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Cubbage Trustee 20 October 2018 None on record
JOHN BULLOCK Trustee 25 October 2014 None on record
Lord ALEXANDER JOHN RANDALL Trustee 10 October 2020
THE BAT CONSERVATION TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
SARACENS SPORT FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
UK OVERSEAS TERRITORIES CONSERVATION FORUM Charity reporting is up to date
HUMAN TRAFFICKING FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
Linda Margaret Grant Trustee 10 October 2020 None on record
HELEN MARY BROWNING OBE Trustee 13 December 2016 None on record
Prof Sir Adrian Leonard Webb Trustee 12 December 2017 None on record
Professor Rosemary S Hails Trustee 13 December 2016 None on record
Kevin John Cox Chair 07 October 2017 None on record
PROFESSOR COLIN GALBRAITH Trustee 12 October 2013 None on record
Martin Stuart Saunders Trustee 07 October 2017 None on record
Deborah Jean Pain Trustee 26 October 2019 None on record
Matthew Benjamin Taylor Trustee 20 October 2018 None on record
Judith Annett Trustee 10 October 2020 None on record
Kerry Elizabeth Ten Kate Trustee 20 October 2018 None on record
Victoria Jane Nash Trustee 26 October 2019 None on record
Veronica Moraa Pickering Trustee 26 October 2019 None on record
The Viscount Christopher Philip Roger Mills Trustee 07 October 2017 None on record
Jennifer Ullman Trustee 15 December 2020 None on record