THE MOST VENERABLE ORDER OF THE HOSPITAL OF ST JOHN OF JERUSALEM (THE ORDER OF ST JOHN)

Charity number: 235979
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Major General Mark Jeremy Strudwick CBE Trustee 24 June 2019 None on record
Alain Louis Joseph Laurencelle Trustee 25 June 2020 None on record
RT REVEREND TIMOTHY JOHN STEVENS Trustee 31 August 2016 None on record
Cameron John Oxley Trustee 25 June 2020 None on record
Surgeon Rear Admiral Lionel John Jarvis CBE Trustee 25 June 2016
THE PRIORY OF ENGLAND AND THE ISLANDS OF THE MOST VENERABLE ORDER OF THE HOSPITAL OF ST. JOHN OF JERUSALEM
Professor Mark Raymond Compton AM Trustee 25 June 2018 None on record
John Chew Mean Mah QC Trustee 25 June 2016 None on record
Sir Paul Michael Williams OBE Trustee 25 June 2020 None on record
Sir Andrew John Cash OBE Trustee 20 September 2018 None on record
Kevin Thomas Williams Trustee 24 June 2019 None on record
Mairi Christina Arthur Trustee 28 February 2018 None on record
Dr Gillian Elisabeth Willmore Trustee 25 June 2020 None on record