ESTA STRING TEACHERS ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 266193
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Edmund Wilson Trustee 15 May 2016 None on record
Gwilym Hooson Trustee 15 May 2016 None on record
Sarah Drury Trustee 01 June 2018 None on record
JOHN HOWARD SHAYLER Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Kadiatu Kanneh Trustee 14 June 2020 None on record
Andrea Jones Trustee 01 June 2018 None on record
William Bruce Trustee 14 June 2020 None on record
Elizabeth Goble Trustee 15 May 2016 None on record
Simon Jones Trustee 17 May 2015 None on record
Vera Pereira Trustee 15 May 2016 None on record
Dr Louise Lansdown Trustee 17 May 2015
QUARTET OF PEACE TRUST (UK) On time
NATIONAL YOUTH STRING ORCHESTRA On time
Cecily Mendelsshon Trustee 01 June 2018 None on record
Prof Joanne Cole Trustee 15 May 2016 None on record
Cathy Elliott Trustee 07 May 2017 None on record