CANTERBURY THEATRE AND FESTIVAL TRUST

Charity number: 279714
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR KEITH CHARLES MANDER Chair
THE CANTERBURY FESTIVAL FOUNDATION On time
HUGO BARTON Trustee 08 June 2011 None on record
Dr Dan Lloyd Trustee 01 December 2015 None on record
Hilary Riva OBE Trustee 18 November 2019 None on record
HUGH JOHN EDWARD SUMMERFIELD BA FCA Trustee
KENT COUNTY AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY On time
THE CANTERBURY FESTIVAL FOUNDATION On time
CELIA GLYNN-WILLIAMS Trustee 07 July 2016
THE CANTERBURY FESTIVAL FOUNDATION On time
CAMILLA SWIRE Trustee None on record
Andrew T Ironside Trustee 17 September 2014 None on record
Christopher Nickols Trustee 10 July 2018 None on record
Mr Tony Walder Trustee 07 July 2016 None on record
COLIN CARMICHAEL OBE Trustee 06 July 2016
THE MAGNA CARTA TRUST On time
Peter Hermitage Trustee 14 March 2014 None on record
DR KATE ELISABETH NEALES Trustee
THE CANTERBURY FESTIVAL FOUNDATION On time
Professor Alistair Borthwick Trustee 23 July 2020 None on record
Tony Pratt Trustee 07 July 2016
THE CANTERBURY FESTIVAL FOUNDATION On time