OXFORD THEATRE GUILD

Charity number: 294056
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Edward Smith Trustee 19 June 2019 None on record
Ruth Lily Walker Trustee 09 May 2018 None on record
DAVID LONG Trustee None on record
Matthew Blurton Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
SIMON JOHN TAVENER Chair 27 April 2017 None on record
Ruth Readshaw Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
Timothy Eyres Trustee 19 June 2019 None on record
Martha Zumack Trustee 09 May 2018 None on record
SUSAN JANE BAXTER Trustee 28 October 2013 None on record
DOMINIC HARGREAVES Trustee 28 October 2013 None on record