Trustees SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF THE SUDANS (UK)
Charity number: 328272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gill Lusk | Chair | 17 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Aly Verjee | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Rebecca Elizabeth Bradshaw | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Azim El Hassan | Trustee | 22 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Charlotte Vera Martin | Trustee | 16 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Francis Peter Gotto | Trustee | 16 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Mawan Gordon Muortat | Trustee | 16 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Zoe Cormack | Trustee | 16 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Fidaa Mahmoud | Trustee | 16 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Robinson Hogan | Trustee | 17 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Rev ANDREW CHARLES WHEELER | Trustee | 17 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
Dr ADRIAN PETER THOMAS OBE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.