MECHANICS FOR AFRICA

Charity number: 1086333
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID PHILLIPS Trustee 12 February 2009 None on record
Paul Cannings Trustee 23 November 2019 None on record
David Lucas Chair 07 February 2015
PREMIER CHRISTIAN MEDIA TRUST On time
SARAH ELIZABETH COUNTER Trustee 12 March 2001 None on record
Peter Richard Herring Trustee 13 July 2019 None on record
Richard Rowe Trustee 07 February 2015 None on record
Susan Margaret Mooney Trustee 18 January 2020 None on record