THE JAZZ CENTRE (UK)

Charity number: 1167421
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Kass Trustee 22 February 2020 None on record
DIGBY FAIRWEATHER Trustee 02 June 2016 None on record
MATTHEW ROBERT FISHER Trustee 13 April 2017 None on record
ROBERT MICHALSKI Trustee 02 June 2016 None on record
ADRIAN GREEN Trustee 03 June 2016 None on record
MICHAEL SCOTT FOSTER Trustee 13 April 2017 None on record
John Peter Wilson Trustee 07 February 2018 None on record
PAUL RICHARDS Trustee 02 June 2016 None on record
Gareth Charles Evans Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record