COVERDALE MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 1174155
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN GEOFFREY LAMBERT Trustee 23 June 2015 None on record
LIZ SHEEHAN Trustee 23 June 2015 None on record
Dr Jenny Walker Trustee 23 June 2015 None on record
JOHN DAVID HERBERT Trustee 23 June 2015 None on record
Kathleen Utley Trustee 23 June 2015 None on record
AMANDA SIMPSON Trustee 23 June 2015 None on record
Matthew Wilkes Trustee 22 March 2019 None on record
Keith Suttill Trustee 23 June 2015
WEST SCRAFTON WATER TRUST On time
Andrew Dent Trustee 23 June 2015 None on record
HOWARD THOMAS DIP AD Trustee 01 May 2000
NORTH YORKSHIRE DALES METHODIST CIRCUIT On time
DAN HESELTINE Trustee 23 June 2015 None on record
Lea Taylor Trustee 22 May 2019 None on record
KIMBERLEY MICHELLE BRERETON Trustee 23 June 2015 None on record
CAROLINE HARRISON Trustee 01 May 2014 None on record
JOHN PETER SUTTILL Chair 01 May 2016 None on record