FUTURE OF RUSSIA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1093811
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 January 2018 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 11 November 2016 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)