OLD NATIONAL SCHOOLS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities which advance the welfare of young people in the parish of Holy Trinity, Hull
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 25 July 1991: Standard registration
- ST JOHN WALTHAM STREET TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Robin Alden MSc MRi | Trustee | 28 July 2024 |
|
|||||||
Iain Alexander Ogilvie BA Hons | Trustee | 28 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Fenwick MBE | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|||||||
MR SAM MCGAW | Trustee |
|
||||||||
TIM WILSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148 | £29 | £15 | £248 | £858 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 29 APRIL 1991
Charitable objects
(1) IN PROVIDING FOR ANY SCHOOL IN OR SUBSTANTIALLY SERVING THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE MOST HOLY AND UNDIVIDED TRINITY KINGSTON UPON HULL SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF A KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY (2) IN PROMOTING RELIGIOUS EDUCATION (3) IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING)OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE SAID ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE
Area of benefit
HOLY TRINITY PARISH KINGSTON UPON HULL
Contact information
- Address:
-
77 BARRINGTON AVENUE
HULL
HU5 4AZ
- Phone:
- 01482342353
- Email:
- FENWICC77@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window