ANGLO-JAPANESE CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Proclamation and furtherance of the Gospel of Jesus Christ, preaching and teaching of the Christian faith, particularly among Japanese residing in, or visiting the United Kingdom. Current activities include: Toddler Group, parenting courses and English classes for Japanese families, hospitality for Japanese families and students, co-ordinating local Japanese Christian Fellowship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Manchester City
- Stockport
- Japan
Governance
- 10 February 1992: Standard registration
- 17 September 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 17 September 2015: Funds transferred to 213834 JAPAN CHRISTIAN LINK
- A J C M (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.94k | £35.67k | £34.66k | £41.30k | £32.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.26k | £36.66k | £36.18k | £38.02k | £36.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 20 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | 20 July 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 21 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | 21 July 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 17 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | 17 August 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | 23 June 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | 23 June 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31 JANUARY 1992
Charitable objects
THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND ELSEWHERE BUT IN PARTICULAR AMONGST JAPANESE MEN WOMEN AND CHILDREN RESIDING IN OR VISITING THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window