FAUNA & FLORA INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fauna & Flora's shared purpose is to protect the diversity of life on Earth, for the survival of the planet and its people. We work closely with local conservation partners around the world to save nature, together. We harness this collective expertise to inspire positive change globally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£36,800,352
Donations and legacies | £4.43m | |
Charitable activities | £31.33m | |
Other trading activities | £3.68k | |
Investments | £839.57k | |
Other | £193.59k |
Total expenditure:
£41,875,055
Raising funds | £4.59m | |
Charitable activities | £37.23m | |
Other | £58.35k |
£9,006 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £4,196,721 from 24 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £4.65m | |
Charitable expenditure | £37.23m |
People

628 Employee(s)
16 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 8 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 4 |
£90k to £100k | 3 |
£100k to £110k | 4 |
£140k to £150k | 3 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Anguilla
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Australia
- Barbados
- Belize
- Burma
- Cambodia
- Cape Verde
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Dominica
- Dominican Republic
- Ecuador
- Georgia
- Ghana
- Grenada
- Guinea
- Honduras
- Indonesia
- Jamaica
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Liberia
- Madagascar
- Maldives
- Mozambique
- Nicaragua
- Romania
- Rwanda
- Saint Vincent
- São Tomé And Principe
- Senegal
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- St Lucia
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- The Bahamas
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Turkey
- Uganda
- United States
- Uzbekistan
- Vietnam
Governance
- 13 May 1992: Standard registration
- 18 November 2022: Funds received from 1126090 THE FRANCIS WILDLIFE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
- Fauna & Flora (Working name)
- FAUNA & FLORA INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- FAUNA AND FLORA INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
- FAUNA AND FLORA PRESERVATION SOCIETY (Previous name)
- FFI (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Charles Fitzgerald | Chair | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN CHARLES TYLER | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Dominic Kailashnath Waughray | Trustee | 21 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eyitola St Matthew-Daniel | Trustee | 07 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hernan Gonzalez-Merlani | Trustee | 07 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Lloyd | Trustee | 07 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anthony Thomas Juniper | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Miguel Nogales | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
HUGH PATRICK SLOANE | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
PROF JOANNE WEBSTER | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ABSHIRO SOKA HALAKE | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr ELIZABETH MARY ROGERS | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
KIMBERLY STEWART | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY JAMES BLUMBERG | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anna Gavazzi Asseily | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WILLIAM GIBSON | Trustee | 24 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.26m | £26.47m | £36.49m | £33.17m | £36.80m | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.73m | £24.04m | £25.60m | £30.40m | £41.88m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.75m | £1.73m | £2.42m | £3.36m | £4.20m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.73m | £4.43m | £6.33m | £6.27m | £4.43m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £5.45k | £2.03m | £131.51k | £2.23k | £3.68k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £19.32m | £19.80m | £29.81m | £26.34m | £31.33m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £204.05k | £73.72k | £24.12k | £300.82k | £839.57k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £132.64k | £187.11k | £247.26k | £193.59k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £2.37m | £1.19m | £901.33k | £601.96k | £488.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £21.41m | £22.14m | £22.43m | £27.19m | £37.23m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.32m | £1.90m | £3.17m | £3.16m | £4.59m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £153.64k | £162.12k | £163.33k | £195.83k | £1 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £4.30m | £5.40m | £4.91m | £6.25m | £1 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £55.02k | £58.35k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.60m | £1.64m | £1.68m | £1.90m | £2.07m | |
|
Long-term investments | £10.88m | £12.55m | £20.49m | £23.01m | £20.93m | |
|
Other assets | £7.99m | £6.49m | £9.59m | £10.62m | £13.33m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.71m | £1.39m | £1.62m | £1.90m | £8.11m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/01/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/09/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/09/2009 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/10/2012 as amended on 29 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT BY THE PROTECTION OF BIODIVERSITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY DESIGNING AND IMPLEMENTING GLOBALLY APPLICABLE SOLUTIONS THAT ARE EFFECTIVE LOCALLY; TO ADVANCE THE AWARENESS AND EDUCATION OF ALL SECTORS OF SOCIETY WORLDWIDE IN THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF BIODIVERSITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fauna & Flora International
The David Attenborough Building
Pembroke Street
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 3QZ
- Phone:
- 01223571000
- Email:
- info@fauna-flora.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window