NEW FOREST KEEPERS WIDOWS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial support for retired and serving New Forest Keepers, their widows and dependents experiencing hardship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 19 January 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Craig Harrison | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL PEARSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEREK ALLAN GURNEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.53k | £13.36k | £10.55k | £18 | £23.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.87k | £13.93k | £10.02k | £6.58k | £23.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 MAY 1944 AMENDED BY A SCHEME 20 SEPTEMBER 1994 as amended on 29 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND BENEFIT OF THE FOLLOWING PERSONS(BEING WHOLLY OR IN PART UNABLE TO MAINTAIN THEMSELVES FROM THEIR OWN RESOURCES) NAMELY (1)THE WIDOW OF ANY DECEASED KEEPER OF THE NEW FOREST DURING WIDOWHOOD. (2)ANY INFANT CHILD OF ANY RETIRED OR DECEASED KEEPER OF THE NEW FOREST. (3)ANY RETIRED KEEPER OF THE NEW FOREST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Forestry Commission
The Kings House
High Street
LYNDHURST
SO43 7NH
- Phone:
- 0300 067 4616
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window