RLUK (RESEARCH LIBRARIES UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RLUK's primary purpose is to increase the ability of research libraries to support the research community in the United Kingdom, and beyond.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 September 1993: Standard registration
- RESEARCH LIBRARIES UK (Working name)
- CURL (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Louise Harvell | Chair | 19 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Christopher Bruce Cipkin | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Wendy Heather White | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catriona Cannon | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Gordon Anthony-Edwards | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Teresa Eagleton | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edmund James Thomas Fay | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Lingstadt | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Louise Price | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Charles Upton | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £411.54k | £530.60k | £595.85k | £770.37k | £414.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £430.49k | £380.20k | £585.73k | £631.88k | £459.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £101.63k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £200.00k | £350.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £347.21k | £347.21k | £365.98k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £183.34k | £248.06k | £398.15k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £54 | £586 | £6.24k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £380.20k | £585.73k | £631.88k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £5.05k | £11.20k | £11.68k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £194.13k | £218.79k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/07/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/07/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05/12/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND PROMOTE LIBRARY RESOURCES AND SERVICES FOR RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
RLUK
Room 257
Senate House
Malet Street
London
WC1E 7HU
- Phone:
- 02078628647
- Email:
- helpdesk@rluk.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window