MALONE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Malone Society is named after Edmond Malone, the editor of the first variorum edition of Shakespeare. Since its foundation in 1906, its purpose has been to make more accessible the materials essential for the study of English Renaissance drama. Its publications are renowned for their meticulous scholarship and high standard of accuracy, and are indispensable to students of early drama.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Canada
- Japan
- United States
Governance
- 11 October 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof. Siobhan Christine Keenan | Chair | 07 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maria Shmygol | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Mark Cunningham | Trustee | 04 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Christopher Smith | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Harry Rennells McCarthy | Trustee | 03 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eleanor Collins | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOSE PEREZ DIEZ | Trustee | 02 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lucy Munro | Trustee | 15 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eleanor Lowe | Trustee | 15 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Professor Henry Woudhuysen FBA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Prof. George Richard Proudfoot | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Leah Scragg | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor Catherine Teresa Richardson | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr Katharine Craik | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Martin Wiggins | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.96k | £6.19k | £9.63k | £10.03k | £15.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.54k | £15.69k | £13.07k | £20.23k | £19.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 03 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OF ENGLISH DRAMA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Heatherville
Crumps Brook
Hopton Wafers
KIDDERMINSTER
Worcestershire
DY14 0HS
- Phone:
- 07983027660
- Email:
- malone@reditpublishing.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window