CHRISTIAN CHILD CARE FORUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Creating and holding a database of Christian individuals and organisations operating in the UK; sharing information between them by means of a website, and holding an annual forum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 September 1995: Standard registration
- 12 September 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 12 September 2017: Funds transferred to 1078661 MILL GROVE CHRISTIAN CHARITABLE TRUST
- CHRISTIAN CHILD CARE NETWORK (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.31k | £7 | £416 | £7 | £7 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.78k | £838 | £280 | £326 | £144 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 16 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 24 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 03 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15TH SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE CHRISTIAN CARE AND SUPPORT FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS IN NEED WHETHER MATERIAL PHYSICAL MENTAL EMOTIONAL OR SPIRITUAL AND TO CARE FOR AND PROMOTE THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL EMOTIONAL AND SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT AND WELL- BEING ( WHETHER THROUGH THEIR FAMILIES OR THE COMMUNITY OR OTHERWISE HOWSOEVER) IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE EVANGELICAL ALLIANCE BASIS OF FAITH OR EQUALLY FUNDAMENTAL TRADITIONAL CHRISTIAN CREEDS THAT THEY MAY IN SAFETY AND SECURITY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window