CHRIST'S CHAPEL OF GOD'S GIFT AT DULWICH

Charity number: 1057970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Maintenance of Christ's Chapel of God's Gift at Dulwich as a place of worship.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £105,002
Total expenditure: £112,711

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Southwark

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 November 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Irene Bishop CBE Chair 01 November 2016
THE DULWICH ESTATE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ALFEGE, GREENWICH
Received: On time
Menna Lyn McGregor Trustee 24 June 2024
THE YORK EARLY MUSIC FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ROYAL BALLET SCHOOL ENDOWMENT FUND
Received: On time
J. EDWARD CONWAY FUND
Received: On time
Angel Faith Locken Trustee 24 June 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE DIVINE WITH ST JAMES THE APOSTLE KENNINGTON
Received: On time
Peter Cornforth Trustee 24 June 2024
THE ORMISTON TRUST
Received: On time
THE WHITGIFT FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Patrick Mark Seth Trustee 24 June 2024
None on record
Helen Rachel Gough Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Howard Robert Kerr BA, MBA Trustee 01 January 2023
THE DULWICH ESTATE
Received: On time
DULWICH COLLEGE
Received: On time
Damilola Ayodele Ayeko Trustee 10 December 2022
THE DULWICH ESTATE
Received: On time
Stephen John Parry Trustee 01 August 2021
THE DULWICH ESTATE
Received: On time
Helen Mary Freeman Trustee 01 June 2021
THE DULWICH ESTATE
Received: On time
Rosemarie Bernadette Jones MRICS Trustee 01 April 2020
THE DULWICH ESTATE
Received: On time
Caroline Fiona Price LLB ACA Trustee 01 April 2020
THE DULWICH ESTATE
Received: On time
Thelma Penny Rose King LLB Trustee 01 January 2020
THE DULWICH ESTATE
Received: On time
Ben Simon Kottler BA Law,CFA Trustee 01 January 2020
THE DULWICH ESTATE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £99.57k £63.58k £90.11k £147.04k £105.00k
Total expenditure £78.76k £114.68k £82.11k £109.84k £112.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 February 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 February 2023 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 30 NOVEMBER 1967
Charitable objects
FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF CHRIST'S CHAPEL AT ALLEYN'S COLLEGE OF GOD'S GIFT AT DULWICH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 04 November 1996 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE DULWICH ESTATE
THE OLD COLLEGE
18 GALLERY ROAD
LONDON
SE21 7AE
Phone:
02082991000