THE ASSOCIATION OF LANCASTRIANS IN LONDON TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education of the young in Lancashire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Lancashire
Governance
- 04 February 1997: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward David Roberts | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Erica Stary | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Arnold | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Peter Murray | Trustee | 18 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ADRIAN JOSEPH WADDINGHAM CBE | Trustee | 10 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW SIMON HEALD LEES | Trustee | 10 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.00k | £3.20k | £5.30k | £3.20k | £5.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.84k | £2.45k | £8.00k | £4.33k | £4.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED OF 3 DECEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN FROM THE COUNTY PALATINE OF LANCASTER, BY THE PROVISION OF VISITS TO PLACES OF HISTORICAL OR OTHER INTEREST; TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OR LOANS TO YOUNG PERSONS TO ENABLE THEM TO FURTHER THEIR STUDIES; TO RELIEVE MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION OF LANCASTRIANS IN LONDON, THEIR WIVES OR HUSBANDS AND THEIR CHILDREN WHO ARE POOR,SICK,AGED OR DISABLED; AND TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Kings Road
Flitwick
Bedford
MK45 1EL
- Phone:
- 01525630852
- Email:
- andy.lees@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window