COLCHESTER YMCA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main areas of charitable activity are the provision of safe and affordable accommodation and support; social and personal development. The charity is also involved with outreach community work and youth work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income includes £211,434 from government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 06 February 1997: Standard registration
- 07 December 2016: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 07 December 2016: Funds transferred to 1054070 YMCA ESSEX
- COLCHESTER FOYER (Working name)
- COLCHESTER YMCA FOYER (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £408.59k | £395.47k | £384.36k | £394.48k | £394.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £388.39k | £387.13k | £356.50k | £389.45k | £394.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £211.43k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 27 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2015
(These accounts |
27 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 02 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 02 December 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 12 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 12 November 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 22 OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
(1) TO UNITE THOSE WHO REGARDING JESUS CHRIST AS THEIR GOD AND SAVIOUR ACCORDING TO THE HOLY SCRIPTURES, DESIRE TO BE HIS DISCIPLES IN THEIR FAITH AND IN THEIR LIFE, AND TO ASSOCIATE THEIR EFFORTS FOR THE EXTENSION OF HIS KINGDOM (2) TO LEAD YOUNG PEOPLE TO THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND TO FULLNESS OF LIFE IN HIM (3) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR MEN AND WOMEN WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE (4) TO PROVIDE, IMPROVE AND MANAGE HOUSES AND HOSTELS PROVIDING RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR MEN AND WOMEN OF ALL AGES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS (5) TO ESTABLISH AND PROVIDE DIRECTLY OR IN ASSOCIATION WITH OTHERS TRAINING AND EDUCATION OF ALL KINDS INCLUDING VOCATIONAL EDUCATION, JOB APPLICATION SKILLS, GENERAL SOCIAL SKILLS AND THE LIKE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE COLCHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window