THE ROTARY CLUB OF FARNHAM BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 200435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity supports local and international charitable objectives. This includes: support to international disasters and emergencies, eg. tsunamis, earthquakes: general humanitarian support, eg. distribution of medical equipment in the third world; support to local hospices, hospitals and disabled institutions and support to needy individuals.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £25,688
Total expenditure: £17,997

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire
  • Surrey
  • Burma
  • India
  • Malawi
  • Sudan
  • Uganda

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 September 1961: Standard registration
  • 09 January 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 28 January 2012: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Francis Paul Whitlock BEng MBA Trustee 07 June 2023
ABBEYFIELD WEY VALLEY SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: On time
FARNHAM SWIMMING BATHS TRUST
Received: On time
Michael John Nicholls ACIB BSc Trustee 09 February 2023
None on record
BRIAN THOMAS Trustee 05 December 2019
ABBEYFIELD WEY VALLEY SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: On time
ABBEYFIELD READING SOCIETY LTD
Received: On time
AWVS HARDSHIP FOUNDATION CIO
Received: On time
Dr Roger John Jude Trustee 06 December 2018
None on record
Ian Charles Sargeant Trustee 01 July 2016
THE FARNHAMIAN 400 TRUST
Received: On time
FARNHAM UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
THE HANTS-SURREY BORDER METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
THE MYLNE TRUST
Received: On time
FARNHAM EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MICHAEL WILLIAM ATKINSON CMG MBE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £22.22k £15.28k £33.34k £17.77k £25.69k
Total expenditure £18.74k £12.74k £34.57k £18.02k £18.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 28 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 28 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 07 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 10 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 10 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 04 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE SPINNEY
FARNHAM ROAD
EWSHOT
FARNHAM
GU10 5AU
Phone:
07796177949