PROVISION TRADE BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial assistance to former employees of the provision and allied trades together with their surviving widows and widowers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 September 1987: Standard registration
- 11 October 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- P T B I (Working name)
- THE PROVISION TRADE CHARITY (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Hume | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Clare Cheney | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Mike Mills | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Brian Murrell | Trustee | 07 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Philip John Langslow | Trustee | 02 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
John Nicholas Howard | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Geoff Pearce | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||||
CHARLES LEONARD STORR | Trustee | 16 August 2013 |
|
|
||||||
MR TONY STANTON | Trustee | 27 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||
SARAH ELIZABETH DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
CHARLES RICHARD STEPHEN LINK | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.28k | £38.82k | £44.29k | £46.53k | £54.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.53k | £72.99k | £64.82k | £81.98k | £74.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES 27TH APRIL 1954 AS AMENDED 3RD MAY 1957, 8TH MAY 1959, 1ST MAY 1981 AND 25TH FEBRUARY 1983, AS AMENDED AT A SPECIAL GENERAL MEETING DATED 13TH JULY 2004
Charitable objects
TO AID NECESSITOUS PERSONS IN THE PROVISION TRADE AND THEIR WIDOWS BY WAY OF PENSIONS, GRANTS AND OTHER PAYMENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 29 September 1987 : Standard registration
- 11 October 2022 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
PROVISION TRADE BENEVOLENT INST
17 CLERKENWELL GREEN
LONDON
EC1R 0DP
- Phone:
- 02072532114
- Email:
- secretary@ptbi.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window