NATIONAL ART COLLECTIONS FUND

Charity number: 209174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Art Fund enriches museums and galleries throughout the UK with works of art of all kinds; campaigns for the widest possible access to art; and promotes the enjoyment of art through its membership scheme.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 March 1970: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE ART FUND (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alexander Nairne CBE Chair 23 September 2024
None on record
Sir Nigel Martyn Carrington Trustee 03 July 2023
None on record
Dr David Dibosa Trustee 20 February 2023
None on record
Stella Abadesi Osunsade Trustee 19 October 2022
None on record
Clare Jennifer Gough Trustee 19 October 2022
None on record
Desmond Shawe-Taylor Trustee 19 October 2022
None on record
Madeleine Kennedy Trustee 22 February 2021
None on record
Susan Rees Trustee 22 February 2021
None on record
Satish Padiyar Trustee 22 February 2021
None on record
Anupam Ganguli Trustee 14 January 2020
ENGLISH NATIONAL OPERA
Received: On time
Katrina Brown Trustee 10 December 2018
None on record
Tessa Jackson Trustee 24 September 2018
None on record
Monisha Shah Trustee 26 September 2017
CATERHAM SCHOOL
Received: On time
WIKIMEDIA UK
Received: On time
THE ROYAL COLLECTION TRUST
Received: On time
Richard Deacon CBE RA Trustee 13 July 2015
None on record
Professor Marcia Pointon Trustee 13 July 2015
None on record
JEREMY DAVID FLETCHER PALMER Trustee 23 February 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £17.06m £14.47m £17.64m £13.95m £16.34m
Total expenditure £17.09m £18.07m £16.58m £20.87m £19.40m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £8.04m £7.22m £10.48m £6.08m £7.90m
Income - Other trading activities £653.00k £149.00k £307.00k £447.00k £262.00k
Income - Charitable activities £8.11m £6.78m £6.55m £7.11m £7.82m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £260.00k £321.00k £301.00k £311.00k £359.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £5.96m £3.19m £6.74m £3.30m £3.56m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £15.78m £16.93m £15.50m £19.74m £18.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.31m £1.14m £1.08m £1.13m £1.20m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £15.78m £8.34m £4.55m £6.07m £6.01m
Expenditure - Investment management £93.00k £93.00k £93.00k £97.00k £93.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £5.72m £5.67m £7.12m £7.08m £7.05m
Long-term investments £48.25m £50.10m £49.14m £46.06m £47.85m
Other assets £13.98m £10.60m £14.78m £12.85m £6.52m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £9.64m £10.10m £9.04m £11.85m £7.11m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 20 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL DATED 25TH JANUARY 1949
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE DEPARTMENT OF PRINTS AND DRAWINGS IN THE BRITISH MUSEUM BY THE PURCHASE OF SUCH WORKS OF ART WHETHER ANCIENT OR MODERN AS SHALL BE SUITABLE TO THE DEPARTMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 20 March 1970 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
2 Granary Square
King's Cross
LONDON
N1C 4BH
Phone:
02072254800