BROMLEY AND SHEPPARD'S COLLEGES CHARITY

Charity number: 210337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide housing for Church of England Clergy and their wives/widows and sometimes supporting children.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £408,012
Total expenditure: £399,843

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bromley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 September 1962: Standard registration
  • 16 October 2006: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 16 October 2006: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Bromley & Sheppard's Colleges (Working name)
  • Bromley and Sheppard's Colleges (Working name)
  • BROMLEY AND SHEPPARD'S COLLEGES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Leycester Collins Chair 22 February 2017
None on record
David Willink Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Rev Allie Kerr Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Rev Andrew Tremlett Trustee 25 September 2022
ST PANCRAS CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
CHAPEL MAINTENANCE FUND OF THE MOST DISTINGUISHED ORDER OF ST MICHAEL AND ST GEORGE
Received: On time
THE ORDER OF THE BRITISH EMPIRE CHAPEL FUND
Received: On time
Rev JONATHAN GIBBS Trustee 24 May 2022
None on record
David Stephen Brace Thomas Trustee 04 May 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK, BROMLEY
Received: On time
Rev George Baisley Trustee 17 March 2021
None on record
Tina Hill Trustee 05 September 2018
None on record
Rt Revd and Rt Hon Dame Sarah Mullally Trustee 12 May 2018
None on record
Lynda Stimson Trustee 18 November 2015
None on record
Tony Bentley Trustee 27 August 2014
None on record
CHRISTOPHER SCOTT Trustee 19 February 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, CHISLEHURST
Received: On time
The Most Revd and Rt Hon JUSTIN PORTAL WELBY Trustee 07 August 2013
None on record
JOHN THOROGOOD Trustee
None on record
PETER MORGAN Trustee
None on record
KATHLEEN CRAIG Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £405.68k £370.46k £374.63k £385.89k £408.01k
Total expenditure £407.32k £628.12k £569.93k £425.85k £399.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 23 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE 2 JUNE 1960 CONFIRMED BY THE BROMLEY COLLEGE AND OTHER CHARITIES SCHEME CONFIRMATION ACT 1960.
Charitable objects
PAYMENT OF STIPENDS TO THE FIVE MOST AGED WIDOWS IN BROMLEY COLLEGE.
Area of benefit
BROMLEY AND SHEPPARDS COLLEGE
Registration history
  • 23 September 1962 : Standard registration
  • 16 October 2006 : Removed
  • 16 October 2006 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
THE CHAPLAIN'S HOUSE
BROMLEY & SHEPPARDS COLLEGES
LONDON ROAD
BROMLEY
KENT
BR1 1PE
Phone:
02084604712