Trustees GILBERT MURRAY TRUST
Charity number: 212244

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Louisa Jenkins | Chair | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof Andrew Donald Morrison | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Katherine Harloe | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
DR MARY ROSE WYLES | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Phillip Horky | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gabriel Bodard | Trustee | 17 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jeremy Larkins | Trustee | 17 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Bridges | Trustee | 12 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Richard Alston | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Professor Edward Keene | Trustee | 07 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Wilson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor FIONA MACINTOSH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR MIKE EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR MICHAEL BURNEY TRAPP MA DPHIL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.