THE USK ALMSHOUSES CHARITY

Charity number: 217320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of need

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £8,082
Total expenditure: £8,425

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Monmouthshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 July 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • USK ALMSHOUSES TRUST (Working name)
  • THE USK ALMSHOUSES (Previous name)
  • THE USK ALMSHOUSES FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSAN PATRICIA COWBURN Chair
None on record
David Meirion Howells Trustee 01 May 2022
None on record
Rev Sally Louise Ingle-Gillis Trustee 31 March 2021
HEART OF MONMOUTHSHIRE MINISTRY AREA
Received: On time
TRACEY HUXLEY Trustee 21 October 2011
THE ROGER EDWARDS EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
RICHARD BARRY MORSE Trustee
THE ROGER EDWARDS EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
MR TONY WATKINS Trustee
ROTARY CLUB OF USK - CHARITY ACCOUNT
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.89k £5.89k £5.90k £6.43k £8.08k
Total expenditure £5.78k £6.27k £5.00k £7.65k £8.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 November 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CHANCERY COURT SCHEME OF THE 2 MARCH 1891 AND SCHEMES OF THE 25 MARCH 1891 AND 15 OCTOBER 1912
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE USK ALMSHOUSES
Area of benefit
USK
Registration history
  • 17 July 1967 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
4 Chepstow Road
USK
NP15 1BL
Phone:
01291673233
Website:

No information available