LADY HERBERT'S HOMES

Charity Number: 232066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

accommodation for elderly retired ladies

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £55,480
Total expenditure: £36,073

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Coventry City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 April 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID JOHN EVANS Chair
EVENTIDE HOMES LTD
Received: On time
GENERAL CHARITY (COVENTRY)
Received: On time
THE COVENTRY GENERAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Simon Sharpe Trustee 30 October 2020
EVENTIDE HOMES LTD
Received: On time
DAVID SCOTT'S COVENTRY JUBILEE COMMUNITY CARE TRUST
Received: On time
CRITERION THEATRE LIMITED
Received: On time
THE COVENTRY GENERAL CHARITY
Received: On time
GENERAL CHARITY (COVENTRY)
Received: On time
Councillor Tarlochan Singh Jandu Trustee 21 October 2019
GENERAL CHARITY (COVENTRY)
Received: On time
Dr ROGER NEIL DAVIES Trustee 29 February 2016
KENILWORTH TALKING NEWS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
EVENTIDE HOMES LTD
Received: On time
GENERAL CHARITY (COVENTRY)
Received: On time
THE COVENTRY GENERAL CHARITY
Received: On time
cOUNCILLOR RAM LAKHA OBE Trustee 06 August 2013
GENERAL CHARITY (COVENTRY)
Received: On time
THE TOM MANN CENTRE TRUST
Received: On time
VIVIEN KERSHAW Trustee 09 July 2012
COVENTRY AND NUNEATON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
GENERAL CHARITY (COVENTRY)
Received: On time
EVENTIDE HOMES LTD
Received: On time
MICHAEL JOHN HARRIS MBE JP MA Trustee
THE COVENTRY GENERAL CHARITY
Received: On time
EVENTIDE HOMES LTD
Received: On time
GENERAL CHARITY (COVENTRY)
Received: On time
EDWARD JOHN CURTIS Trustee
THE COVENTRY GENERAL CHARITY
Received: On time
EVENTIDE HOMES LTD
Received: On time
GENERAL CHARITY (COVENTRY)
Received: On time
KENILWORTH LIONS LIMITED
Received: On time
DAVID MASON Trustee
THE COVENTRY GENERAL CHARITY
Received: On time
GENERAL CHARITY (COVENTRY)
Received: On time
TERRY PROCTOR BSC Trustee
GENERAL CHARITY (COVENTRY)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £47.16k £38.35k £39.53k £56.24k £55.48k
Total expenditure £39.87k £31.29k £59.83k £37.51k £36.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 04 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 06 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 08 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GENERAL CHARITIES OFFICE
OLD BABLAKE
HILL STREET
COVENTRY
CV1 4AN
Phone:
02476222769
Website:

No information available